LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wyoming WY
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB0328
Action History
WY
Wyoming House Bill HB0328
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wyoming 2025 Regular Session
Wyoming House Bill HB0328
Action History
House
02/10/2025
COW:H Did not consider for COW
House
02/06/2025
Placed on General File
House
02/06/2025
H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0
House
02/03/2025
Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
House
01/30/2025
Received for Introduction
01/29/2025
Bill Number Assigned