House | 02/10/2025 | COW:Failed 25-34-3-0-0 | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
01/29/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |