House | 03/03/2025 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | No report prior to CoW Cutoff | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 1-8-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-1-0-0 | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
Senate | 01/20/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Senate | 01/20/2025 | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations | ||
12/20/2024 | Bill Number Assigned |