House | 02/28/2025 | COW:H Did not consider for COW | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | 3rd Reading:Laid Back | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals | ||
12/28/2024 | Bill Number Assigned |