Senate | 01/28/2025 | COW:Failed 13-15-1-0-2 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | COW:Laid Back | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue | ||
Senate | 01/02/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
12/28/2024 | Bill Number Assigned |