House | 03/03/2025 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | No report prior to CoW Cutoff | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-3-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
Senate | 01/20/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Senate | 01/20/2025 | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education | ||
01/06/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |