House | 02/25/2025 | 3rd Reading:Failed 23-38-1-0-0 | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-1-0-0 | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education | ||
01/08/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |