LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wyoming WY
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SF0128
Action History
WY
Wyoming Senate Bill SF0128
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wyoming 2025 Regular Session
Wyoming Senate Bill SF0128
Action History
Senate
02/10/2025
COW:S Did not consider for COW
Senate
01/24/2025
Placed on General File
Senate
01/24/2025
S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
Senate
01/21/2025
Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
Senate
01/17/2025
Received for Introduction
01/16/2025
Bill Number Assigned