02/27/2025 | Assigned Chapter Number 57 | |||
02/27/2025 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0027 | |||
House | 02/24/2025 | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0027 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | President Signed SEA No. 0027 | ||
02/24/2025 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0027 | |||
House | 02/24/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor | ||
01/16/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |