Senate | 02/10/2025 | COW:S Did not consider for COW | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/20/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
01/17/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |