03/03/2025 | Assigned Chapter Number 99 | |||
03/03/2025 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0057 | |||
House | 02/27/2025 | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0057 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | President Signed SEA No. 0057 | ||
02/27/2025 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0057 | |||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Concur:Passed 28-1-2-0-0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Received for Concurrence | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-2-0-0 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor | ||
01/21/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |