03/18/2025 | Assigned Chapter Number 157 | |||
03/18/2025 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0074 | |||
House | 03/04/2025 | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0074 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | President Signed SEA No. 0074 | ||
03/04/2025 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0074 | |||
House | 03/04/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | :Rerefer to H08 - Transportation | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations | ||
01/23/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |