Wyoming 2025 Regular Session

Wyoming Senate Bill SF0169 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/06/2025

                            ORIGINAL SENATE ENGROSSED
FILE NO. SF0169
ENROLLED ACT NO. 98, SENATE
SIXTY-EIGHTH LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF WYOMING
2025 GENERAL SESSION
1
AN ACT relating to public funds; repealing the strategic 
investments and projects account; providing for the 
transfer from and the reversion of funds from the strategic 
investments and projects account; making conforming 
amendments; repealing obsolete language; requiring reports; 
and providing for effective dates.
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Wyoming:
Section 1.  W.S. 9-4-220.1 and 9-4-719(b)(intro) and 
(q)(i) are amended to read:
9-4-220.1.  Wyoming state penitentiary capital 
construction account; funds transferred to the account.
(a)  There is created the Wyoming state penitentiary 
capital construction account. 
investments and projects account created by W.S. 9-4-220.  
Funds in the account shall only be expended upon 
legislative appropriation. Through the fiscal year ending 
June 30, 2034, all funds within the account shall be 
invested in the pool A investment account by the state 
treasurer pursuant to W.S. 9-4-715(p). Thereafter, all 
funds within the account shall be invested as determined by 
the state treasurer. All investment earnings from the 
account shall be credited to the account. For purposes of 
accounting and investing only, the Wyoming state 
penitentiary capital construction account shall be treated 
as a separate account from the strategic investments and 
projects account.
(b)  Beginning on June 30,  for fiscal year 
2021  and June 30 of each fiscal year thereafter as 
provided in this subsection, the state treasurer shall  ORIGINAL SENATE ENGROSSED
FILE NO. SF0169
ENROLLED ACT NO. 98, SENATE
SIXTY-EIGHTH LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF WYOMING
2025 GENERAL SESSION
2
transfer ten million dollars ($10,000,000.00), or as much 
thereof as is available, from any unobligated funds within 
the 
to the Wyoming state penitentiary capital construction 
account. The state treasurer shall cease transferring funds 
to the Wyoming state penitentiary capital construction 
account pursuant to this subsection on July 1, 2038.
9-4-719.  Investment earnings; spending policy 
amounts; permanent funds.
(b)  There is created the permanent Wyoming mineral 
trust fund reserve account. All funds within the account 
shall be invested by the state treasurer as authorized 
under W.S. 9-4-715(a), (d), (e) and (r) and all investment 
earnings from the account shall be credited to the account.  
Except for funds specified by the legislature that 
guarantee the obligations of permanent Wyoming mineral 
trust fund investment earnings and funds to be transferred 
into the permanent Wyoming mineral trust fund, funds 
deposited into the reserve account created by this 
subsection are intended to be inviolate and constitute a 
permanent or perpetual trust fund. Beginning July 1, 2021 
for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, to 
the extent funds are available, the state treasurer shall 
transfer unobligated funds from this account to the general 
fund on a quarterly, pro-rata basis as necessary to ensure 
that an amount equal to two and one-half percent (2.5%) of 
the previous five (5) year average market value of the 
permanent Wyoming mineral trust fund, calculated on the 
first day of the fiscal year, is available for expenditure 
during each fiscal year. As soon as possible after the end 
of each of the fiscal years beginning on and after July 1, 
2017, after making any transfer required 
paragraphs (i) and (ii) of  this subsection, revenues in  ORIGINAL SENATE ENGROSSED
FILE NO. SF0169
ENROLLED ACT NO. 98, SENATE
SIXTY-EIGHTH LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF WYOMING
2025 GENERAL SESSION
3
this account in excess of two hundred forty-five percent 
(245%) of the spending policy amount in subsection (d) of 
this section shall be credited to the permanent Wyoming 
mineral trust fund. For fiscal year  and for each 
fiscal year thereafter:
(q)  The earnings from the permanent Wyoming mineral 
trust fund under W.S. 9-4-204(u)(iii) during each fiscal 
year beginning July 1, 2016, which are less than the 
spending policy established in subsection (d) of this 
section are appropriated from the general fund subject to 
subsection (s) of this section and the following:
(i)  Any earnings in excess of two and one-half 
percent (2.5%) of the previous five (5) year average market 
value of the trust fund, calculated from the first day of 
the fiscal year and less than or equal to the spending 
policy amount specified in subsection (d) of this section 
shall be credited to the legislative stabilization reserve 
account; created by W.S. 9-4-219 and the strategic 
investments and projects account created by W.S. 9-4-220 in 
equal amounts;
Section 2.  W.S. 9-4-220 and 9-4-719(b)(i) are 
repealed. 
Section 3.  The strategic investments and projects 
account is repealed.
Section 4.  
strategic investments and projects account, except funds in 
the Wyoming state penitentiary capital construction account 
within the strategic investments and project account, shall 
be transferred by the state auditor to the general fund. 
Any unexpended funds that have been appropriated or  ORIGINAL SENATE ENGROSSED
FILE NO. SF0169
ENROLLED ACT NO. 98, SENATE
SIXTY-EIGHTH LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF WYOMING
2025 GENERAL SESSION
4
obligated from the strategic investments and projects 
account before July 1, 2026 shall be paid from the general 
fund. Any funds that are directed to revert by law to the 
strategic investments and projects account shall revert to 
the general fund. All accrued revenues that would otherwise 
be deposited in the strategic investments and projects 
account shall be deposited in the general fund.
Section 5.  Not later than October 31, 2026 and again 
not later than October 31, 2027, the state auditor shall 
report to the joint appropriations committee on the amounts 
transferred under section 4 of this act.
Section 6. On the effective date of this section, the 
state auditor shall transfer ten million dollars 
($10,000,000.00), or as much thereof as is available, from 
the strategic investments and projects account to the 
department of state parks and cultural resources for the 
siting, construction, operation and maintenance of the 
Wyoming state shooting complex. These funds shall not be 
transferred or expended for any other purpose.
Section 7. On the effective date of this section, the 
state auditor shall transfer nine million dollars 
($9,000,000.00) from the Wyoming state penitentiary capital 
construction account within the strategic investments and 
project account to the department of corrections for 
purposes of integrating the department's security system. 
These funds shall not be transferred or expended for any 
other purpose. ORIGINAL SENATE ENGROSSED
FILE NO. SF0169
ENROLLED ACT NO. 98, SENATE
SIXTY-EIGHTH LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF WYOMING
2025 GENERAL SESSION
5Section 8. 
(a)  Except as provided in subsection (b) of this 
section, this act is effective July 1, 2026.  
(b)  Sections 6 through 8 of this act are effective 
immediately upon completion of all acts necessary for a 
bill to become law as provided by Article 4, Section 8 of 
the Wyoming Constitution.
(END)
Speaker of the HousePresident of the SenateGovernorTIME APPROVED: _________DATE APPROVED: _________
I hereby certify that this act originated in the Senate.
Chief Clerk