03/19/2025 | Assigned Chapter Number 162 | |||
03/19/2025 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0089 | |||
House | 03/05/2025 | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0089 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | President Signed SEA No. 0089 | ||
03/04/2025 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0089 | |||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Concur:Passed 28-3-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Received for Concurrence | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-2-0-0 | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | :Rerefer to H06 - Travel | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations | ||
01/23/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |