House | 02/28/2025 | COW:H Did not consider for COW | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 0-6-1-0-0 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-2-0-0 | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-1-0-0 | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | :Refer to S02 - Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor | ||
01/27/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |