Senate | 02/12/2025 | 3rd Reading:Failed 10-20-1-0-0 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
01/27/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |