All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB313
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Beginning January 1, 2030, establishes a wealth asset tax of one per cent of the state net worth of each individual taxpayer who holds $20,000,000 or more in assets in the State. Effective 4/23/2057. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB314
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires corporations to include the income of all foreign subsidiaries to the State. Applies the State's apportionment formula to determine the share of reported profits subject to the appropriate tax. Effective 1/1/2026.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB315
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Creates an expedited permitting process to authorize the destruction or control of feral pigs on privately owned land, if the feral pigs have caused or are likely to cause substantial damage to agricultural or aquacultural crops, indigenous plants or wildlife, or pose a threat to human health and safety.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB316
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires lot owners in subdivisions that are not planned communities to pay for the repair and maintenance of subdivision roads. Authorizes counties to assess and collect fees for repair and maintenance of subdivision roads if no courtappointed or deeddesignated entity is authorized to do so. Requires counties to provide certain services to associations. Restricts provisions to counties having a population greater than 200,000 but less than 500,000. Extends the reporting date and sunset date for the working group established pursuant to Act 200, SLH 2022. Appropriates moneys.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB317
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes the Board of Lactation Consultants of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs and requires that lactation consultants be licensed by the board.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB318
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to adopt rules establishing privacy requirements for directtoconsumer genetic testing in the State. Requires the Department's rules to specify whether consumers' genetic information may be used for purposes of investigative genetic genealogy.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB319
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Refer
1/28/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Changes from 1 ounce to 30 grams the minimum amount of marijuana that constitutes the offense of promoting a detrimental drug in the second degree. Increases from 3 grams or less to 15 grams or less the amount of marijuana that constitutes the offense of promoting a detrimental drug in the third degree.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB32
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Adopts the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact to regulate the practice of telepsychology and temporary in-person, face-to-face practice of psychology by psychologists across state boundaries in the performance of their psychological practice. Requires the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to adopt rules to implement and administer the Compact.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB320
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Restricts civil asset forfeiture to cases involving the commission of a felony offense where the property owner has been convicted of an underlying felony offense. Directs forfeiture proceeds to the general fund. Amends the allowable expenses for moneys in the criminal forfeiture fund. Requires the Attorney General to adopt rules necessary to carry out the purpose of the Hawaii Omnibus Criminal Forfeiture Act. Amends the deadline for the Attorney General to report to the Legislature on the use of the Hawaii Omnibus Criminal Forfeiture Act. Limits the transfer of certain forfeiture property to federal agencies. Establishes records requirements.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB321
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Provides that in any county with a population of less than 250,000, fee simple absolute title of a privately owned highway, road, alley, street, way, lane, bikeway, bridge, or trail is deemed transferred to adjacent property owners or the community association if certain conditions are met. Effective 7/1/2027. Sunsets 7/1/2032. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB322
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to achieve the full funding, including estimated payment increases, of Medicaid home- and community-based services. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB323
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Authorizes a person intoxicated by alcohol, under the influence of drugs, or incapacitated by substances, including a minor, to voluntarily admit themself to a psychiatric facility or a behavioral health crisis center for an emergency evaluation to determine need for treatment.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB324
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Mandates reimbursement for services provided by participating registered pharmacists practicing within their scope of practice by private and public health plans in the State beginning January 1, 2026.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB325
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/18/25
Engrossed
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Provides a tax credit to taxpayers and makes deposits to the emergency and budget reserve fund and other post-employment benefits trust fund pursuant to article VII, section 6, of the Hawaii State Constitution. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB326
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/18/25
Engrossed
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Requires the Legislature, in establishing or reviewing a revolving fund, to ensure the revolving fund is financially self-sustainable by either annual projections that show that the revolving fund will be sustainable without appropriations of general funds or a schedule of projected collections of outstanding payments to the revolving fund. (CD1)