All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB787
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Health to establish and operate a free statewide mental health warm line to provide mental health support in non-emergency situations.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB788
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Establishes a two-year pilot program in the Probate Court and Family Court of the First Circuit to fund certain guardianship and conservatorship related court resources in situations where the respondent does not have sufficient funds to pay for one or more of the resources and the court has deemed the resource or resources beneficial. Requires the Judiciary to submit reports to the Governor and Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 4/23/2057. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB789
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Reduces the amount the Department of Education is authorized to charge for school meals to all students enrolled in department schools to no more than one-quarter of the cost of preparing the meals. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB79
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/2/25
Refer
4/14/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to determine the effect of any proposed state or county housing projects that may affect a historical property, an aviation artifact, or a burial site within ninety days of a request for determination. Establishes historic review requirements based on the project area's known historic, cultural, and archaeological resources. Establishes procedures and notification requirements if previously unidentified human remains or previously unidentified historic property are discovered. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB790
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the Department of Education to establish a food waste composting pilot project at Nanakuli High and Intermediate School. Appropriates moneys.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB791
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Prohibits certain food dye additives from being served in school meals of the Department of Education and charter schools.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB792
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Refer
1/28/25
Establishes the offense of criminal street gang participation, solicitation, recruitment, or retention. Provides for enhanced penalties for crimes committed by a defendant while part of a criminal street gang.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB793
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires condominiums and planned community associations to issue monthly damage and repair reports, have a reserve study done every 3 years, have a fully funded reserve, and only spend reserve funds to maintain the property.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB794
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Prohibits the Department of Land and Natural Resources and Board of Land and Natural Resources from disposing of or approving the use or setting aside of public lands for the establishment of any immigration detention facility. Prohibits state and county agencies from contracting with the federal government for this purpose.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB795
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Provides access by owners of motor vehicles and independent repair facilities to motor vehicle manufacturer diagnostic and repair information and diagnostic repair tools otherwise made available to dealers.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB796
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Prohibits claims for refunds, reimbursements, or other payments, authorization for which is sought from the Legislature that exceed the time limitations of section 40-68, Hawaii Revised Statutes, from being claimed. Requires the Attorney General to include in the Attorney General's annual report of claims recommended for approval a total dollar amount of possible judgments against the State that have not yet settled. Requires the Attorney General's report to the Legislature describing the claims against the State to include additional information. Requires the Attorney General to submit a report every five years to the Legislature containing further incidents that occurred in an agency that led to a claim. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB797
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the Department of Human Services to automatically enroll, or authorize the Social Security Administration to automatically enroll, in the State's Medicaid program any individual in the State who receives federal Supplemental Security Income benefits. Requires reports to the Legislature.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB798
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes a Child Welfare Services Branch (CWS) Oversight Commission within the Department of the Attorney General to review and assess case management procedures, training, staffing levels and other support given to CWS and address issues identified in the 2024 Auditor's Report on CWS and make recommendations on actions to reduce child harm and death and for legislation, funding, and other needs for CWS to support the goals of the Commission. Requires annual status reports to the Legislature. Dissolves the Commission on 6/30/2028. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB799
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the Department of Education to select materials for inclusion, circulation, and exclusion in school library collections according to certain criteria. Requires the Department of Education to uphold the freedom to read. Prohibits the Department of Education from excluding books based on certain criteria. Requires the State Librarian to select materials for inclusion, circulation, and exclusion in school library collections according to certain criteria. Requires the State Librarian to uphold the freedom to read. Prohibits the State Librarian from excluding books based on certain criteria.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB8
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Refer
2/6/25
Beginning 1/1/2027, allows an advanced practice registered nurse to claim exemption from service as a juror. Effective 12/31/2050. Sunsets 1/1/2032. (SD1)