All Bills - Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR33
Introduced
3/31/14
Introduced
3/31/14
Passed
4/1/14
Passed
4/1/14
Commends the ULL Ragin' Cajuns men's basketball team upon winning the Sun Belt Conference.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR34
Introduced
3/31/14
Passed
4/1/14
Passed
4/1/14
Commends the Southern University Law Center as an institution that promotes and perpetuates the advancement of all citizens of the state and designates April 2, 2014, as "SULC Day at the Capitol".
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR35
Introduced
3/31/14
Introduced
3/31/14
Passed
4/1/14
Passed
4/1/14
Commends Paxton Turner, a junior at LSU in Baton Rouge, on being named a Goldwater Scholar.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR36
Introduced
3/31/14
Passed
4/1/14
Commends the 1963 McNeese State College Football Team for its historic season.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR37
Introduced
3/31/14
Introduced
3/31/14
Passed
4/1/14
Passed
4/1/14
Commends the service and contributions of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Louisiana Links Day at the State Capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR38
Introduced
4/2/14
Introduced
4/2/14
Passed
4/3/14
Passed
4/3/14
Posthumously commends Al J. Ransome for his service to the state of Louisiana.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR39
Introduced
4/2/14
Introduced
4/2/14
Passed
4/3/14
Passed
4/3/14
Commends Brandon Oubre of Norco on being awarded the Goldwater Scholarship from the Barry M. Goldwater Scholarship and Excellence in Education Program.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR4
Introduced
3/11/14
Passed
3/12/14
Commends Hunter Hopkins on his numerous accomplishments, his exemplary and impressive academic achievements, and on being selected as a recipient of the LSU University Medal.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR40
Introduced
4/2/14
Introduced
4/2/14
Passed
4/2/14
Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association for its outstanding achievements and designates the week of March 31, 2014, as Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Week.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR41
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/7/14
Commends D. Neil Granger, PhD, and his research team upon receipt of clinical designation as a new Center for Cardiovascular Disease and Sciences at LSU Health Sciences Center Shreveport.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR42
Introduced
4/7/14
Introduced
4/7/14
Refer
4/8/14
Refer
4/8/14
Report Pass
5/14/14
Report Pass
5/14/14
Passed
5/15/14
Passed
5/15/14
Commends the Republic of China, known as Taiwan, for economic relations with Louisiana.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR43
Introduced
4/7/14
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/7/14
Passed
4/7/14
Recognizes Monday, April 7, 2014, as LSU Day at the State Capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR44
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/8/14
Commends Randy K. Haynie on being honored at the UL Lafayette 18th Annual Spring Gala for his outstanding contributions to the university and to the Lafayette community.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR45
Introduced
4/7/14
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/8/14
Passed
4/8/14
Recognizes Tuesday, April 8, 2014, as March of Dimes Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR46
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/8/14
Commends Alyssa Carson on her academic and other notable achievements.