All Bills - Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR24
Introduced
4/14/15
Passed
4/15/15
Expresses condolences upon the death of Deacon Chairman Emeritus Jesse Spears Jr.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR25
Introduced
4/14/15
Introduced
4/14/15
Passed
4/15/15
Passed
4/15/15
Declares April 21, 2015, as KBD Day at the State Capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR26
Introduced
4/14/15
Passed
4/15/15
Commends the Beta Xi Chapter of Kappa Beta Delta Business Honor Society at Baton Rouge Community College.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR27
Introduced
4/20/15
Passed
4/20/15
Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR28
Introduced
4/20/15
Introduced
4/20/15
Passed
4/20/15
Passed
4/20/15
Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR29
Introduced
4/20/15
Passed
4/20/15
Passed
4/20/15
Commends Leanne Reese Easterling on being crowned Miss Louisiana Junior Pre-Teen Cover Girl at the 2014 Louisiana National American Miss Pageant.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR3
Introduced
4/13/15
Introduced
4/13/15
Passed
4/14/15
Passed
4/14/15
Commends Tara MacInnes for her tireless works with Moyamoya disease and recognizes May 6, 2015, as Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR30
Introduced
4/20/15
Introduced
4/20/15
Passed
4/21/15
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences upon the death of Oscar Robertson Jr.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR31
Introduced
4/20/15
Introduced
4/20/15
Passed
4/20/15
Passed
4/20/15
Expresses condolences upon the death of Rudolph "Bob" Narcisse Sr.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR32
Introduced
4/20/15
Passed
4/20/15
Recognizes the Vietnamese-American community and commends its celebration of the fortieth anniversary of settlement and prosperity in Louisiana.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR33
Introduced
4/21/15
Introduced
4/21/15
Passed
4/21/15
Passed
4/21/15
Designates April 23, 2015, as School-Based Health Care Awareness Day in Louisiana.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR34
Introduced
4/21/15
Passed
4/21/15
Passed
4/21/15
Commends the Mill Creek Pentecostal Church and Cemetery upon the celebration of its 100th anniversary.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR35
Introduced
4/21/15
Passed
4/22/15
Passed
4/22/15
Commends Grady Gaubert on his election as chairman of the Petroleum Marketers Association of America.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR36
Introduced
4/22/15
Introduced
4/22/15
Passed
4/22/15
Commends Viona Lapeyrouse Chabert on the occasion of her eightieth birthday.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR37
Introduced
4/22/15
Passed
4/22/15
Commends Southern University and recognizes Wednesday, April 22, 2015, as Southern University Day at Louisiana State Capitol.