Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR27

Introduced
4/20/15  

Caption

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

Impact

The resolution serves as a public endorsement of ExxonMobil’s continued commitment to Louisiana, which is instrumental in both sustaining existing jobs and generating new employment opportunities. It signifies recognition of the importance of corporate partnerships in driving local economic development while boosting the image of companies actively engaging in community betterment activities, such as volunteering and charitable contributions. By formally recognizing such companies, the state government aims to foster an environment that appreciates industry contributions, which can lead to more robust economic growth for Louisiana.

Summary

Senate Resolution 27 is a commendatory resolution dedicated to ExxonMobil, recognizing April 20, 2015, as 'ExxonMobil Day' at the Louisiana State Capitol. The resolution highlights the significant contributions of ExxonMobil to the state's economy, underscoring its role as a major employer with over 11,000 employees, retirees, and contractors spread across numerous facilities in Louisiana. The resolution commends the company's long-standing operations, which have been instrumental in shaping the energy and petrochemical landscape of the state through innovation and contributions to local communities.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SR27 is predominantly positive, framing ExxonMobil as a partner in the growth and vitality of the state. Legislative support for the resolution reflects a broader sentiment that glorifies the role of large corporations in providing economic stability and community engagement. This positive framing aligns with sentiments expressed by community members who benefit from ExxonMobil's operations, emphasizing the pride taken in having such an influential company committed to Louisiana’s future.

Contention

While the resolution itself is largely commendatory and does not inherently provoke contentious debate, it exists within a broader context where the role of large corporations in local economies can be debated. Critiques may arise surrounding environmental concerns and the long-term implications of dependency on an industry focused heavily on fossil fuels. Although the resolution promotes ExxonMobil's achievements and community involvement, those who oppose such corporations may view public endorsements as a dismissal of environmental and social responsibilities, thus indicating a potential point of contention.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR22

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA HR28

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR11

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature and commends ExxonMobil on their long-term contributions to the state of Louisiana

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA HR5

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA SR28

Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.