Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR28

Introduced
4/20/15  
Introduced
4/20/15  
Passed
4/20/15  

Caption

Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.

Impact

The passing of this resolution not only symbolizes recognition of ExxonMobil's longstanding dedication but also sheds light on its significant role during Hurricane Katrina. The refinery served as a command center in the recovery efforts and has provided substantial financial support for rebuilding initiatives, including donations exceeding $23 million for hurricane recovery efforts. It has focused on improving local educational programs and fostering community engagement through support for various charitable organizations and environmental projects.

Summary

Senate Resolution No. 28 commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for its century-long operation in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, recognizing April 20, 2015, as 'ExxonMobil Day' at the Louisiana State Senate. The resolution highlights the refinery's historical significance, its role in the local community, and the contributions it has made over the years to the region's economy and social fabric. The Chalmette Refinery, a joint venture with PetrĂ³leos de Venezuela, S.A., has become a pivotal employer and taxpayer within St. Bernard Parish, employing approximately one thousand individuals directly and contributing significantly to local tax revenues.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding this resolution is predominantly positive, emphasizing pride in local industry and appreciation for the support provided by ExxonMobil to the community. The acknowledgment of 'ExxonMobil Day' reflects a broader celebration of the contributions made by the refinery, which resonates well with the local residents and businesses who benefit from its operations and initiatives. The resolution effectively highlights the collaborative spirit between a major corporation and the community, underscoring the importance of private sector involvement in local welfare.

Contention

While the resolution received favorable attention, it is important to consider that such recognitions can spark discussions regarding the environmental impacts of refinery operations. Although the resolution commends the refinery's community involvement, some community members and environmental advocates may voice concerns about potential regulatory issues or environmental challenges associated with industrial operations. However, the resolution predominantly seeks to showcase ExxonMobil's commitment to local prosperity and improved quality of life, reducing any contention by focusing on its philanthropic efforts and contributions.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HR32

Commends the Chalmette Refinery for 100 years of operation in St. Bernard Parish

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR5

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA HR28

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR32

Designates Monday, April 15, 2019 as ExxonMobil Day at the capitol