Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR28

Introduced
4/17/17  
Introduced
4/17/17  
Passed
4/18/17  

Caption

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

Impact

The impact of HR28 extends to the local communities, where ExxonMobil has been a crucial employer and taxpayer. The company is noted for paying significant state and local taxes, contributing over one billion dollars in the past decade alone, which reinforces public services and infrastructure. Additionally, ExxonMobil actively participates in community development through volunteerism and financial support for educational initiatives, particularly in STEM programs. Their commitment to education is exemplified by a $13 million funding grant to enhance math and science education in Louisiana schools.

Summary

House Resolution 28 (HR28) commends ExxonMobil for its longstanding contributions to the state of Louisiana, recognizing April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol. The resolution highlights over a century of partnership between ExxonMobil and Louisiana, underscoring the company's significant role in the state's economy through its operations, which include the Baton Rouge Refinery and various plants across the state. The resolution conveys appreciation for the jobs created and the economic stability provided by ExxonMobil's presence in the region.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding HR28 is overwhelmingly positive, reflecting a strong bipartisan appreciation for the economic and social contributions of ExxonMobil to the state. Legislators from both parties have expressed pride in the company's achievements and the benefits it brings to Louisiana, framing the resolution as an acknowledgment of corporate responsibility and community involvement. The tone of the discussions emphasizes gratitude and admiration for ExxonMobil's longstanding operational history and commitment to innovation.

Contention

While the resolution is generally well-received, there may be underlying tensions regarding the environmental implications of ExxonMobil's operations. Critics of the oil and gas industry often highlight concerns over environmental issues and the sustainability of such energy sources. However, HR28 focuses on the positive outcomes associated with ExxonMobil, including advancements in safety and environmental leadership, while avoiding contentious debates about the broader impacts of fossil fuel dependence. Thus, the resolution serves as a unifying commendation of a major industry player within Louisiana.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR22

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR11

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature and commends ExxonMobil on their long-term contributions to the state of Louisiana

LA HR5

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA SR28

Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.