Louisiana 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR5

Introduced
3/19/12  

Caption

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

Impact

The resolution underscores ExxonMobil's engagement in local communities through volunteering and charitable contributions, thereby reinforcing the company's role as a key business partner in Louisiana. The notable mention of its operations, spanning from the Haynesville Shale to the Gulf of Mexico, highlights the breadth of its influence within the state. This may serve to enhance the state’s image as a favorable environment for energy and petrochemical industries, potentially drawing further investment and interest from similar enterprises.

Summary

House Resolution 5 (HR5) represents a commendation of ExxonMobil, recognizing its significant contributions to the economy of Louisiana and its commitments to the community. The resolution aims to designate March 19, 2012, as 'ExxonMobil Day' at the Louisiana State Capitol, highlighting the positive economic impact of the company. With over eleven thousand employees and contractors in Louisiana, ExxonMobil is acknowledged as one of the top employers in the state, contributing to both job creation and job retention across various regions.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding HR5 appears overwhelmingly positive among the legislators, primarily those sponsoring the resolution. This reflects a state-level appreciation for the economic contributions of large firms like ExxonMobil. The resolution may also resonate well with constituents who benefit from job opportunities and community support initiatives led by the company. However, it also opens the floor for discussions on the role of such corporations in social responsibility and environmental stewardship.

Contention

While HR5 serves to commend ExxonMobil, it raises discussions about corporate influence in state politics and the potential for environmental implications associated with large industrial operations. Critics might argue that such resolutions can sometimes overshadow the need for stricter environmental regulations and accountability measures for large corporations. Thus, while the resolution promotes a positive image of ExxonMobil's contributions, there is an underlying tension regarding the balance between economic growth and environmental responsibilities.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR22

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR28

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR11

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature and commends ExxonMobil on their long-term contributions to the state of Louisiana

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA SR28

Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.