Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR22

Introduced
3/21/16  
Introduced
3/21/16  
Passed
3/21/16  

Caption

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

Impact

The resolution acknowledges ExxonMobil's long-standing presence and influence in the energy and petrochemical sectors in Louisiana. By recognizing the company’s contributions, the resolution emphasizes the need for strong partnerships between state entities and major industrial players. This partnership is framed as beneficial not only for economic growth but also for job retention and creation, which are critical for the state's workforce and overall economic vitality.

Summary

Senate Resolution 22, introduced by Senator Barrow, serves to commend ExxonMobil and designate March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol. The resolution highlights ExxonMobil's significant role in the state's economy, noting that the company is a leading employer in Louisiana, with over eleven thousand employees, retirees, and contractors. It underscores the substantial financial contributions made by ExxonMobil to state and local economies, including over $4.1 billion in payroll wages and more than $1 billion in taxes over the past decade.

Sentiment

Overall, the sentiment surrounding SR22 is overwhelmingly positive. Supporters view the resolution as a way to celebrate and honor a significant corporate entity that has provided jobs and economic resources to the state. The accolades presented reflect an appreciation for the operational success of ExxonMobil and its commitment to community engagement, safety, and environmental stewardship. Such recognition aims to bolster corporate-community relations and foster continued investment in local economies.

Contention

While the resolution does not appear to generate explicit opposition, it may spark discussions about the balance of corporate influence in state matters and potential environmental concerns tied to industrial operations. Recognizing a corporation like ExxonMobil also raises questions about the implications for local governance and regulatory autonomy, particularly in light of varying community priorities around environmental impacts and industrial accountability.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR28

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR11

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature and commends ExxonMobil on their long-term contributions to the state of Louisiana

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA HR5

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA SR28

Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.