Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR35

Introduced
3/17/14  
Introduced
3/17/14  
Passed
3/18/14  

Caption

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

Impact

The resolution emphasizes ExxonMobil's long-standing contributions through job creation, community involvement, and environmental initiatives. It showcases the company’s dedication to operating responsibly and the vital role its facilities serve in generating tax revenue, promoting economic growth, and meeting energy demands. HR35 serves not only to honor the existing impact of ExxonMobil but also to reinforce the importance of such corporations in the economic landscape of Louisiana, particularly in the energy sector.

Summary

House Resolution 35 (HR35), introduced by Representative Barrow, is a commendation aimed at recognizing ExxonMobil and declaring March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol. This resolution highlights the significant role that ExxonMobil has played in contributing to the Louisiana economy and improving the quality of life for its citizens. With over eleven thousand employees, retirees, and contractors in the state, ExxonMobil is acknowledged as one of the largest employers, making substantial impacts in various regions of Louisiana from the Haynesville Shale to petrochemical facilities and beyond.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding HR35 is largely positive, focusing on appreciation and recognition for ExxonMobil’s contributions to both the economy and community welfare. The resolution reflects a collaborative partnership between ExxonMobil and local communities, highlighting efforts in corporate social responsibility, community volunteering, and environmental leadership. There appears to be a celebration of the partnership rather than opposition, indicating general support from lawmakers and the public for recognizing businesses that contribute to economic stability.

Contention

While HR35 is primarily a celebratory resolution without much contention, it does bring to the forefront discussions around corporate influence in local economies and the responsibilities of large companies towards their communities. By officially recognizing ExxonMobil, the resolution might stir discussions regarding the balance of economic development and environmental stewardship, as well as local concerns about the voices of community members in decisions influenced by large corporations. However, specific points of contention are not explicitly addressed in the resolution.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR22

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR28

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR11

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature and commends ExxonMobil on their long-term contributions to the state of Louisiana

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA HR5

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA SR28

Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.