Louisiana 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR11

Introduced
3/19/18  
Introduced
3/19/18  
Passed
3/20/18  

Caption

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature and commends ExxonMobil on their long-term contributions to the state of Louisiana

Impact

The resolution highlights the economic benefits provided by ExxonMobil, including tax revenues and charitable contributions. In particular, ExxonMobil's operations contribute over one hundred million dollars annually in state and local taxes. The engagement in local education initiatives, such as funding grants to improve math and science education, reflects the company's commitment to fostering community development and preparing future generations for careers in the energy sector.

Summary

House Resolution 11 commemorates ExxonMobil for its significant contributions to the state of Louisiana, designating March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature. The resolution recognizes ExxonMobil's historical role in the local economy, emphasizing the company's long-standing presence in the state and its impact on job creation, particularly through its various facilities in locations such as Baton Rouge and Cotton Valley.

Sentiment

Overall, the sentiment surrounding the bill is positive, with legislators expressing gratitude for ExxonMobil's contributions to job retention, economic growth, and community involvement. This favorable view is underscored by the recognition of ExxonMobil's role as one of Louisiana's top employers and the acknowledgment of its safety and environmental efforts. The resolution aims to solidify a collaborative relationship between the state and the corporation, promoting further investment and development.

Contention

While the resolution is largely celebratory, potential points of contention could arise in discussions surrounding environmental concerns associated with large energy corporations. Although the resolution notes ExxonMobil's commitment to environmental responsibility, critics may still voice concerns about the ecological impacts of their operations. As such, while the resolution aims to commend corporate contributions, it may inadvertently spark debates about the broader implications of industrial activity within the state.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR22

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR28

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR5

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA SR28

Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.