Louisiana 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR32

Introduced
4/10/19  
Introduced
4/10/19  
Passed
4/15/19  

Caption

Designates Monday, April 15, 2019 as ExxonMobil Day at the capitol

Impact

The passage of HR32 highlights ExxonMobil's role as a top employer in Louisiana, with over six thousand employees and contractors in the Baton Rouge area alone. The resolution underscores ExxonMobil's financial contributions to the state through substantial tax payments, exceeding one hundred million dollars annually. Moreover, it emphasizes the company's engagement in community activities and education, including a notable funding commitment towards math and science education initiatives in local schools, which reflects its long-term investment in the state's human capital.

Summary

House Resolution 32, proposed by Representatives Jordan and Smith, designates April 15, 2019, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana legislature. The resolution aims to commend ExxonMobil for its significant contributions to the state's economy and the well-being of its citizens over more than a century of operations in Louisiana. Among the notable mentions is ExxonMobil's historical roots in the state and its evolution into a major employer and contributor to local industries, particularly in Baton Rouge where it has established substantial manufacturing facilities.

Sentiment

Overall, the sentiment surrounding HR32 appears to be overwhelmingly positive, particularly among legislators and community leaders who view ExxonMobil as a vital partner in economic development. The resolution expresses gratitude and recognition of ExxonMobil's longstanding presence and contributions, fostering a celebratory atmosphere that aligns with the interests of the state's economic and employment sectors. Nonetheless, there may be concerns from environmental groups and local communities related to the oil and gas industry's broader impacts, although these points are not explicitly addressed in the resolution.

Contention

While HR32 does not contain explicit points of contention, there could be underlying concerns associated with the oil and gas industry's practices and their environmental implications. The resolution praises ExxonMobil’s environmental initiatives and safety record, yet the support for the oil sector often faces scrutiny concerning ecological impacts. Additionally, the designation day itself may lead to debates about the appropriateness of honoring such corporations in light of broader economic and environmental challenges faced by communities in Louisiana.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA SR22

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR28

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR11

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature and commends ExxonMobil on their long-term contributions to the state of Louisiana

LA HR5

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol