Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR32

Introduced
4/20/15  
Introduced
4/20/15  
Passed
4/21/15  

Caption

Commends the Chalmette Refinery for 100 years of operation in St. Bernard Parish

Impact

The resolution recognizes the importance of the Chalmette Refinery not only as an industrial facility but also as a vital community partner. It underscores the refinery's contributions of approximately $23 million to hurricane recovery efforts, with specific allocations for local educational institutions and cultural initiatives. This acknowledgment from the legislature aims to solidify the refinery's ongoing presence as a cornerstone of economic stability and recovery in the region.

Summary

House Resolution 32 commends the Chalmette Refinery for its centennial operation in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana. The resolution highlights the refinery's long-standing contributions to the local economy and its role in community recovery efforts, particularly in the aftermath of Hurricane Katrina. The refinery, which was established in 1915 and later acquired by ExxonMobil, has evolved to meet the changing energy demands while significantly impacting the local economy through job creation and community support initiatives.

Sentiment

The sentiment depicted in the resolution is overwhelmingly positive, as it reflects pride in the refinery's sustained operation and its contributions to the community. The recognition by the Louisiana House of Representatives serves to celebrate the significant economic and social roles that such institutions play within their localities, fostering a sense of collaboration between large corporations and the communities they operate in.

Contention

While the resolution fosters a celebratory tone regarding the refinery's contributions, it does not delve into potential criticisms or controversies surrounding the operations of such facilities. A thorough analysis of the broader implications of fossil fuel production and potential environmental concerns could provide a balanced view. However, this resolution primarily focuses on recognizing the positive aspects of the refinery's history and its integral part in the local economy.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR28

Commends the ExxonMobil Chalmette Refinery for one hundred years of operation and commitment in St. Bernard Parish, Louisiana, and recognizes April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Senate.

LA SR183

Recognizes Wednesday, June 5, 2019, as St. Bernard Parish Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR65

Recognizes Tuesday, April 28, 2015, as St. Bernard Parish Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA HR167

Designates May 1, 2024, as St. Bernard Parish Day at the capitol

LA HR51

Recognizes Tuesday, April 28, 2015, as St. Bernard Parish Day at the state capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol