Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Corrections Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/11/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/24/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/17/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Finance
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Received from the House
04/10/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Vet Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
03/28/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
03/21/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 H No action taken in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 H Left pending in committee
03/16/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Failed to pass to engrossment
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H No action taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Education
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
03/09/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Received from the House