Date
Event
Location
05/21/2023
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
05/17/2023
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/21/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/28/2023 S Returned from the House for further action
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
05/10/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
05/03/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/26/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
04/19/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 6 2023 3:49PM
04/12/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to Business & Industry: May 4 2023 8:56PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to Energy Resources: May 4 2023 8:56PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/05/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 4 2023 8:56PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/29/2023
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 11 2023 8:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Referred to Energy Resources: May 3 2023 4:20PM
03/22/2023
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 12 2023 12:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 14 2023 11:51AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately