LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Committees
Veteran Affairs
Calendar
TX
Senate Veteran Affairs Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Senate Veteran Affairs Committee
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/16/2023
Veteran Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB387
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
HB671
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1457
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2499
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
HB2951
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB4421
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
05/12/2023
Veteran Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
05/09/2023
Veteran Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB562
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
HB587
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2248
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB4615
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/04/2023
Veteran Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB422
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB653
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1376
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1859
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/21/2023
Veteran Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB63
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
SB371
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB493
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
SB538
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
SB777
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1308
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1598
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23