Date
Event
Location
05/05/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
05/05/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
04/29/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
04/29/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
04/22/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
04/22/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
04/14/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/14/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/07/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
03/31/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
03/24/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 03/24/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
03/17/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 03/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
03/10/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee