Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Senate Transportation Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/07/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/07/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
04/23/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 1 2025 5:10PM
04/23/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
04/16/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
04/16/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
04/09/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker: May 1 2025 5:10PM
04/02/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
03/26/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
03/12/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 03/20/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM