Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar