Senate | 05/10/2024 | REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | CRA | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | VERSION: HB 114 | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | SCHRAGE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | PASSED Y22 N18 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 114 | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N23 | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2024 | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | FN1: ZERO(DEC) | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | DNP: MEARS, DIBERT | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | DP: MCCABE, RAUSCHER, SADDLER, WRIGHT, BAKER, MCKAY | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | RES RPT 6DP 2DNP | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | RES REPLACED CRA REFERRAL | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | CRA | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |