House
|
08/01/2024
|
VETOED BY GOVERNOR 7/30/24
|
|
|
House
|
07/16/2024
|
9:00 A.M. 7/16/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y36 N4
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y34 N6
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 25
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR TAKEN UP Y38 N2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
VERSION: SCS CSHB 122(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
PASSED Y18 N2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 122(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N10
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
RULES TO FIRST SUP CALENDAR 5/15/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
NR: STEDMAN, OLSON, WILSON, MERRICK, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
DP: HOFFMAN, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 25
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FIN RPT SCS 2DP 5NR NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
VERSION: CSHB 122(FIN) AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
PASSED Y40
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 122(FIN) AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): ALLARD, CARPENTER, STAPP, STUTES
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N37 A2
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y27 N13
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
FIN CS ADOPTED Y35 N5
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM: STAPP
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
DP: HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, COULOMBE, TOMASZEWSKI, EDGMON, D.JOHNSON, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 1AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): D.JOHNSON, C.JOHNSON, CRONK, WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
AM: MINA
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
DP: STUTES, MCKAY, VANCE, C.JOHNSON, MCCABE
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
TRA RPT CS(TRA) NEW TITLE 5DP 1AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
TRA, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|