Alaska 2023-2024 Regular Session

Alaska House Bill HB122 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2024
Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024