House
|
06/14/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y39 N1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 29
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR READ TAKEN UP
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR READ AND HELD
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
VERSION: SCS CSHB 125(RES) AM S
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
PASSED Y19 N- A1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 125(RES)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
RES SCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
FN2: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
NR: WILSON, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
FIN RPT SCS(RES) 4DP 2NR TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
FN2: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
AM: KAWASAKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
NR: WIELECHOWSKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, DUNBAR, KAUFMAN, CLAMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
RES RPT SCS 5DP 1NR 1AM TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
RES, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
VERSION: CSHB 125(RES)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
PASSED Y40
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 125(RES)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N37
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
RES CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FN1: (DNR)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
AM: JOSEPHSON
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
DP: TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, ORTIZ, GALVIN, STAPP, EDGMON, D.JOHNSON, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FIN RPT CS(RES) 8DP 1AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
FN1: (DNR)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
NR: MCCABE, PATKOTAK
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
DP: MEARS, ARMSTRONG, DIBERT, SADDLER, WRIGHT, RAUSCHER, MCKAY
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
RES RPT CS(RES) 7DP 2NR
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
RES, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|