Alaska 2023-2024 Regular Session

Alaska House Bill HB125 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024
Bill April 14, 2023