House
|
06/11/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
STUTES, SADDLER
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): TILTON, ARMSTRONG, CRONK, STAPP, CARRICK, RAUSCHER, COULOMBE,
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y40
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 26
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR READ AND TAKEN UP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
VERSION: SCS CSHB 202(FIN) AM S(EFD ADD S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
BJORKMAN, OLSON, MERRICK, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, TOBIN, KAWASAKI, WILSON, GIESSEL, CLAMAN,
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 202(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
RULES TO FIRST SUP CALENDAR 5/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FN3: (DOH)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(EED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
DP: HOFFMAN, OLSON, WILSON, KIEHL, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FIN RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
VERSION: CSHB 202(EDC)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
GRAY, MEARS, MCCABE, VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN, HIMSCHOOT, WRIGHT, SCHRAGE, JOSEPHSON, BAKER, ALLARD,
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
PASSED Y37 N2 E1
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 202(EDC)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
AM NO 3 FAILED Y1 N37 E1 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N36 E1
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
EDC CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): C.JOHNSON, STORY, TOMASZEWSKI, MCCORMICK, RUFFRIDGE, FOSTER,
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
FN3: (DOH)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(EED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
NR: COULOMBE, STAPP
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
DP: CRONK, ORTIZ, JOSEPHSON, HANNAN, GALVIN, TOMASZEWSKI, D.JOHNSON, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
FIN RPT CS(EDC) 8DP 2NR
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
FIN REPLACED HSS REFERRAL
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(DOH)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(EED)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
AM: HIMSCHOOT, STORY, MCKAY, ALLARD, RUFFRIDGE
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
DNP: PRAX
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
DP: MCCORMICK
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
EDC RPT CS(EDC) 1DP 1DNP 5AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
EDC, HSS
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|