House | 05/15/2024 | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y38 N1 A1 | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | CONCUR TAKEN UP | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | CONCUR READ AND HELD | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | VERSION: HB 395 AM S | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | PASSED Y20 N- | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 395 AM S | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | NR: TOBIN | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | DP: KAUFMAN, MYERS | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | TRA RPT 2DP 1NR | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | TRA | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | VERSION: HB 395 | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | PASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2 | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 395 | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/29 CALENDAR | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N37 E1 | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2024 | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | NR: C.JOHNSON, MINA | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | DP: MCKAY, VANCE, MCCABE | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | TRA RPT 3DP 2NR | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | TRA | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |