House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 268
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/30/24
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN21: (LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN20: (COR)
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN19: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN18: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2024
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 7/11 CHAPTER 11 SLA 24
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
1:50 P.M. 7/1/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y33 N6 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 15
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR READ AND TAKEN UP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
VERSION: SCS CSHB 66(FIN) AM S
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
PASSED Y19 N1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AM NO 10 ADOPTED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AM NO 9 FAILED Y3 N17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AM 1 TO AM 8 FAILED Y6 N14
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AM NO 8 FAILED Y6 N14
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AM NO 7 OFFERED ON 5/14 WAS WITHDRAWN
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/14 CAL WITH AMENDMENT 7 PENDING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 7 OFFERED AND PENDING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 6 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 5 ADOPTED Y15 N5
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 4 FAILED Y8 N12
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 3 FAILED Y6 N14
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 66(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FN23: ZERO(DFC)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FN22: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FN17: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FN16: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FN12: ZERO(DFC)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
AM: WILSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
NR: KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FIN RPT SCS 3DP 3NR 1AM NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FIN RPT RECD W/SCS AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FN16: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FN15: (DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FN14: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FN13: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FN12: ZERO(DFC)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FN11: ZERO(COR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FN10: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FN9: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
AM: TOBIN, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
NR: KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
DP: CLAMAN, GIESSEL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
JUD RPT SCS 2DP 1NR 2AM NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
JUD, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
VERSION: CSHB 66(FIN) AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
PASSED Y35 N5
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
AM NO 12 ADOPTED Y33 N6 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
AM NO 11 WITHDRAWN
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
RESCIND ACTION (ADOPTED) AM 11 UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
RETURNED TO SECOND FOR AMS UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 66(FIN) AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 11 ADOPTED Y36 N4
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 10 FAILED Y15 N25
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 8 FAILED Y17 N23
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 7 FAILED Y1 N38 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 6 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 9 WITHDRAWN
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 9 NOT TABLED Y13 N26 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NOS 4 AND 5 NOT OFFERED
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y28 N12
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N33
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N23
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
FIN CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FN8: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FN7: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FN6: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FN5: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FN4: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(DFC)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(COR)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
AM: JOSEPHSON, GALVIN
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
NR: CRONK, HANNAN, STAPP, ORTIZ, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
DP: EDGMON, D.JOHNSON
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 2DP 5NR 2AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
FN7: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
FN6: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
FN5: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
FN4: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
FN3: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(DFC)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(COR)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
AM: GRAY
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
NR: GROH
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
DNP: EASTMAN
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
DP: C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, ALLARD, VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 4DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
FN6: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
FN5: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
FN4: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
FN3: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(DFC)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(COR)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
JUD, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|