LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Alaska AK
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB66
Draft Versions
AK
Alaska House Bill HB66
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Alaska 2023-2024 Regular Session
Alaska House Bill HB66
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 8, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 15, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 14, 2024
Compare
Bill
May 13, 2024
Compare
Bill
May 3, 2024
Compare
Bill
May 10, 2023
Compare
Bill
May 8, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 27, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 8, 2023
Compare