House
|
07/25/2024
|
LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 30
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2024
|
9:50 A.M. 7/25/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
VERSION: HJR 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
PASSED Y18 E1 A1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
DUNBAR, WIELECHOWSKI, KAWASAKI, TOBIN, KIEHL, STEVENS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, BISHOP, STEDMAN, OLSON, GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(H.TRB)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
DP: TOBIN, BJORKMAN, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
EDC RPT 5DP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
EDC
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
VERSION: HJR 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, GALVIN, CRONK, MEARS, ORTIZ
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
PASSED Y36 N1 E2 A1
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
CALL FOR THE QUESTION PASSED Y36 N1 E2 A1
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y35 N1 E2 A2
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
POINT RULED OUT OF ORDER
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
MOTION TO CALL FOR THE QUESTION
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): STORY, BAKER, ARMSTRONG, MINA
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/26 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(H.TRB)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
DP: CARRICK, DIBERT, VANCE, MCCORMICK
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
TRB RPT 4DP
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): GRAY, DIBERT
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
TRB
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|