House
|
05/06/2024
|
REFERRED TO FINANCE
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
FN5: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
FN4: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
FN3: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
DP: GRAY, GROH, SUMNER, ALLARD, VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
JUD RPT HCS(STA) 5DP
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
FN5: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
FN4: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
FN3: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
NR: WRIGHT, CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, ALLARD
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
DP: CARRICK, STORY, SHAW
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
STA RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 4NR
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
STA, JUD, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 12(JUD)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 12(JUD)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GRAY-JACKSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
JUD CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): TOBIN, DUNBAR
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
FN1: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
AM: WILSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
NR: STEDMAN, MERRICK, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
DP: OLSON, HOFFMAN, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
FIN RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 3NR 1AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
FN1: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
AM: KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
DP: CLAMAN, TOBIN, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
JUD RPT CS 3DP 1AM NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
FN1: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
NR: WIELECHOWSKI, BJORKMAN, MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
DP: KAWASAKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
STA RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
STA, JUD, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23
|
|
|