Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 6/14 CHAPTER 9 SLA 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
12:00 P.M. 6/7/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 55(FIN) AM H
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): GALVIN
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
PASSED Y39 N1
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 55(FIN) AM H
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
AM NO 3 FAILED Y1 N39
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N18
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
AM 1 TO AM 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
AM NO 1 OFFERED
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
FN2: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
DP: GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, COULOMBE, EDGMON,
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
FIN RPT 9DP
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
FN2: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
DP: FIELDS, CARRICK, RUFFRIDGE, PRAX, WRIGHT, SADDLER, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
L&C RPT 7DP
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
L&C, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 55(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 55(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/12 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
FIN CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
FN2: (CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, MERRICK, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
DP: HOFFMAN, OLSON, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
FIN RPT CS 3DP 4NR NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
FN1: (CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
NR: MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
DP: BISHOP, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
L&C, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|