House | 04/09/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | FN1: (EED) | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | DNP: UNDERWOOD, SCHWANKE, ELAM | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | EDC RPT RECD AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): HALL | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | EDC, FIN | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/25 |