1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | HB0028a -1- HB 28 |
---|
3 | 3 | | New Text Underlined [DELETED TEXT BRACKETED] |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 34-LS0303\A |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | HOUSE BILL NO. 28 |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | IN THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF ALASKA |
---|
14 | 14 | | |
---|
15 | 15 | | THIRTY-FOURTH LEGISLATURE - FIRST SESSION |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | BY REPRESENTATIVE STORY |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | Introduced: 1/10/25 |
---|
20 | 20 | | Referred: Prefiled |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | A BILL |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | FOR AN ACT ENTITLED |
---|
26 | 26 | | |
---|
27 | 27 | | "An Act establishing a student loan repayment pilot program; and providing for an 1 |
---|
28 | 28 | | effective date." 2 |
---|
29 | 29 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF ALASKA: 3 |
---|
30 | 30 | | * Section 1. The uncodified law of the State of Alaska is amended by adding a new section 4 |
---|
31 | 31 | | to read: 5 |
---|
32 | 32 | | STUDENT LOAN REPAYMENT PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The Alaska Commission 6 |
---|
33 | 33 | | on Postsecondary Education shall develop and administer a student loan repayment pilot 7 |
---|
34 | 34 | | program. A person applying for a grant must submit the application to the commission not 8 |
---|
35 | 35 | | later than October 31, 2025, on a form provided by the commission. Subject to appropriation, 9 |
---|
36 | 36 | | the commission may award a grant to a person who is employed as a full-time certificated 10 |
---|
37 | 37 | | teacher in a public school or as a full-time employee of the state and 11 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) has completed a postsecondary degree or certificate program located 12 |
---|
39 | 39 | | outside the state, was a resident of the state for at least 12 months before attending the out-of-13 |
---|
40 | 40 | | state institution, and has an outstanding student loan as described in 26 U.S.C. 108(f)(2) 14 34-LS0303\A |
---|
41 | 41 | | HB 28 -2- HB0028a |
---|
42 | 42 | | New Text Underlined [DELETED TEXT BRACKETED] |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | incurred by the person for the degree or certificate program located outside the state; or 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) has completed a postsecondary degree or certificate program from the 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | University of Alaska, has resided outside the state for at least 12 months before beginning 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | full-time employment as a certificated teacher in a public school or as a full-time employee of 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | the state, and has an outstanding student loan as described in 26 U.S.C. 108(f)(2) incurred by 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | the person for the degree or certificate program from the University of Alaska. 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | (b) The commission shall 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) establish an application process for participation in the program; 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | (2) implement policies to determine the efficacy of the program toward 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | improving the recruitment and retention rates of teachers and state employees who receive a 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | grant under this section; and 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | (3) evaluate the effects of the program on employee recruitment and retention 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | for the purpose of preparing the report required under sec. 2 of this Act. 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (c) The commission may require a person to refinance the outstanding student loan 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | described in (a) of this section with the commission in order to participate in the program. 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | (d) Grants awarded under this section are payable 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (1) for a person employed as a full-time certificated teacher in a public school, 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | upon completion of the person's contract term; or 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | (2) for a person employed as a full-time employee of the state, upon the 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | person's merit anniversary date. 20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | (e) A person may receive a grant under the program each year for a maximum of three 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | years. A person with outstanding student loans used to pay for a degree or certificate program 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | located outside the state or at the University of Alaska 23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) totaling $24,000 or more is eligible to receive a grant of $8,000 in each 24 |
---|
68 | 68 | | year of participation in the program; or 25 |
---|
69 | 69 | | (2) totaling less than $24,000 is eligible to receive a grant of one-third of the 26 |
---|
70 | 70 | | balance of the outstanding student loans in each year of participation in the program. 27 |
---|
71 | 71 | | (f) Up to 125 grants may be awarded under this section each fiscal year. The total 28 |
---|
72 | 72 | | dollar amount of grants awarded under this section may not exceed $1,000,000 in a fiscal 29 |
---|
73 | 73 | | year. If the amount appropriated in a fiscal year is insufficient to meet the amounts awarded 30 |
---|
74 | 74 | | under (a) of this section, the commission shall reduce pro rata the amounts awarded by the 31 34-LS0303\A |
---|
75 | 75 | | HB0028a -3- HB 28 |
---|
76 | 76 | | New Text Underlined [DELETED TEXT BRACKETED] |
---|
77 | 77 | | |
---|
78 | 78 | | necessary percentage as determined by the commission. 1 |
---|
79 | 79 | | (g) The commission may adopt regulations necessary to implement this section. 2 |
---|
80 | 80 | | (h) In this section, "commission" means the Alaska Commission on Postsecondary 3 |
---|
81 | 81 | | Education. 4 |
---|
82 | 82 | | * Sec. 2. The uncodified law of the State of Alaska is amended by adding a new section to 5 |
---|
83 | 83 | | read: 6 |
---|
84 | 84 | | PILOT PROGRAM: REPORT. On or before December 31, 2025, December 31, 2026, 7 |
---|
85 | 85 | | and December 31, 2027, the Alaska Commission on Postsecondary Education shall submit a 8 |
---|
86 | 86 | | report to the senate secretary and chief clerk of the house of representatives and notify the 9 |
---|
87 | 87 | | legislature that the report is available. The reports must include the effects of the student loan 10 |
---|
88 | 88 | | repayment pilot program under sec. 1 of this Act on teacher and state employee recruitment 11 |
---|
89 | 89 | | and retention. The report submitted by December 31, 2027, must include an analysis of the 12 |
---|
90 | 90 | | overall success rate and effectiveness of the student loan repayment pilot program. 13 |
---|
91 | 91 | | * Sec. 3. Sections 1 and 2 of this Act are repealed January 1, 2028. 14 |
---|
92 | 92 | | * Sec. 4. This Act takes effect immediately under AS 01.10.070(c). 15 |
---|