Senate | 04/30/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CAL | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2025 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | NR: HUGHES | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | DNP: MYERS | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | DP: GIESSEL, DUNBAR, CLAMAN, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | RES RPT 5DP 1DNP 1NR | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | REFERRED TO RESOURCES | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | RES | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | VERSION: CSHJR 11(RES) AM | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, HIMSCHOOT, GALVIN, STUTES, SCHRAGE | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | COSPONSOR REMOVED: RAUSCHER | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | PASSED Y33 N4 E2 A1 | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 11(RES) AM | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | RES CS ADOPTED UC | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2025 | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): HOLLAND, GRAY | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | NR: COULOMBE | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): DIBERT, FIELDS | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): STORY | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | RES RPT RECD W/CS AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT |